Docking, Annie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 91115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Counselling Services
Carleton University
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-6674
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Richmond Goulbourn Medical Clinic
6206 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Canada
Phone: 613-838-1223
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annie Docking Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Docking ( CPSO# 91115 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Health and Counselling Services
Carleton University
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE ELIZABETH DOCKING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCKING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012