Dockrill, Karen Gaye (CPSO#: 67982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 2M4
Phone: 905 666-2229
Fax: (905) 666-2115
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN GAYE DOCKRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCKRILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2012
Summary:

On June 18, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Karen Gaye Dockrill committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that she charged a fee for an undertaking to be available to 
provide services to patients, in that she contravened a regulation made under the Medicine Act, 
and in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Dockrill admitted the allegations. 
Dr. Dockrill is a paediatrician who currently practises in Whitby, Ontario. In 2006, Dr. Dockrill 
established a business under the name “Mom and Baby Depot Ltd.” (“MBD”). From 2007 
through 2010, Dr. Dockrill carried out a paediatric practice through MBD that included both the 
provision of primary care to children as well as paediatric consults on referral from a family 
physician. Patients were accepted into Dr. Dockrill’s primary care practice at a family’s request 
only when parents purchased and maintained a membership in MBD, for which they were 
charged a fee. For a single child, this fee ranged between $500 and $2,200 per year. This fee 
failed to comply with the College’s policy with regard to Block Fees and Uninsured Services.  

Ms X’s newborn son was referred to Dr. Dockrill for primary care in June 2007 after he 
underwent surgery at a hospital for a serious condition. When attempting to arrange her son’s 
first appointment, Ms X was told that she would have to pay $1,500 per year for a MBD 
membership as a condition of receiving primary care from Dr. Dockrill. Ms X indicated she was 
not interested in paying for the additional programs and services at MBD and only wanted basic 
insured medical care. As a result, Ms X’s son was not permitted to see Dr. Dockrill for primary 
paediatric care.  

Between 2008 and 2010, the MBD website advertised the benefits of membership in MBD and 
Dr. Dockrill’s professional services. In addition, between 2008 and 2010, the advertising on the 
MBD website included testimonials. 

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Dockrill’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to 
  commence within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order;  
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Dockrill’s 
  certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:  
      a. Dr. Dockrill shall at her own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated 
         instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of the Committee’s 
         Order;  
      b. Dr. Dockrill shall administer block fees for uninsured services in a manner that is 
         consistent with the College’s policy on block fees and uninsured services and, 
         without in any way limiting the generality of that requirement,  

       i. shall not discontinue seeing a patient or refuse to see a new patient because that 
          person chooses not to pay a block fee; and 

      ii. shall not provide, or offer to provide, preferential services to patients who agree to 
          pay a block fee.  
 
      c. Dr. Dockrill shall cooperate with inspections of her practice by representatives of the 
         College for a period of nine (9) months after the completion of the suspension, solely 
         for the purpose of ensuring compliance with this order. Such inspections shall be 
         conducted with at least 24 hours notice being given to Dr. Dockrill before each visit. 
         If any problems with Dr. Dockrill’s block fee practices are discovered within the 9-
         month time period, the College is entitled to extend the monitoring inspections for a 
         further six (6) months.  
- Dr. Dockrill attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
- Dr. Dockrill shall pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00 
  payable by no later than September 1, 2012.  
 
On April 2, 2015, the Discipline Committee directed that the Registrar remove the indefinite 
term, condition, and limitation on Dr. Dockrill’s Certificate of Registration set out at paragraph 
[4] b of the Order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario dated June 18, 2012. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 18-22, 2012