Dodge, Gregory Thomas (CPSO#: 90677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4618
Fax: (905) 338-4639
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory T. Dodge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dodge ( CPSO# 90677 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4618

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY THOMAS DODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DODGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012