Dodge, Jason Esli (CPSO#: 70367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-4178
Fax: (416) 813-4179
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

31 Disera Dr, Unit 210
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Canada
Phone: 905 771-7755
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Esli Dodge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dodge ( CPSO# 70367 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
100 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
210 - 31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ESLI DODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DODGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001