Doganay, Selim (CPSO#: 95016)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Erciyes Universitesi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012