Doherty, Megan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of East Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 523-3617
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN ELIZABETH DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOHERTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012