Doidge, Mark Stephen (CPSO#: 50445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
690A Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G9
Phone: (416) 461-2419
Fax: (416) 461-3129
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit H
170 North Queen Street
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-1177
Fax: 416-626-8286
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 127
701 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2S7
Canada
Phone: 416-630-1333
Fax: 416-630-1323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Doidge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doidge ( CPSO# 50445 )

Business Address:
701 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 461-2419

Business Address:
170 North Queen Street
Unit H
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 626-1177

Business Address:
690A Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G9
Phone Number: (416) 461-2419

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK STEPHEN DOIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIDGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1983

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)