Doig, Jenna Lynn (CPSO#: 95743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview
Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNA LYNN DOIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017