Doiron, Philip Rodney (CPSO#: 90580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Dept of Dermatology
76 Grenville St
5th Floor, Room 5222
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6236
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Dermatology
East Wing, 8th Floor
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Doiron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Doiron ( CPSO# 90580 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Dermatology
5th Floor, 5222
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
8th Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5952

Business Address:
589 King Street East
Suite 1
Toronto ON  M5A 1M6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP RODNEY DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014