Doko, Magbule (CPSO#: 95244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2285 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 3V2
Phone: (519) 254-7979
Fax: (519) 254-0488
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Doko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doko ( CPSO# 95244 )

Business Address:
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Phone Number: (519) 254-7979

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGBULE DOKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014