Dolansky, Gillian Pamela (CPSO#: 88918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613)737-7600 Ext. 3955
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Dolansky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dolansky ( CPSO# 88918 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN PAMELA DOLANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLANSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2013