Dolci, Mirko Nicolas (CPSO#: 78820)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lausanne, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2003 to 07 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2003 to 15 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004