Dollin, Michael Leo Elliot (CPSO#: 86724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Box 307
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6997
Fax: (613) 739-6645
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dollin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chang ( CPSO# 86715 )
Dr. M. Dollin ( CPSO# 86724 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
Box 307
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEO ELLIOT DOLLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2014