Don, Joan Caroline (CPSO#: 62771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 4228
Fax: (705) 328-6121
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Don Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Don ( CPSO# 62771 )

Business Address:
2 Albert Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4J3
Phone Number: (705) 878-9754

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
503 Saputi
OR Department
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone Number: (867) 975-8600

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN CAROLINE DON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990