Donahoe, Laura Lynn (CPSO#: 94896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-985
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6529
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Donahoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Donahoe ( CPSO# 94896 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N-985
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN DONAHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015