Donaldson, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 96934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2014