Donnery, Cara Anne Marie (CPSO#: 79067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Donnery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donnery ( CPSO# 79067 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
2 Fontbonne Building
301 St. James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARA ANNE MARIE DONNERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONNERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008