Donohue, Alicia (CPSO#: 56436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2530 St. Joseph Boulevard
Unit 1
Orleans ON  K1C1G1
Phone: (613)-410-5530
Fax: (613) 830-1791
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alicia Donohue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Donohue ( CPSO# 56436 )

Business Address:
2530 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 410-5530

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICIA DONOHUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOHUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988