Donovan, Jeffrey Cecil Henry (CPSO#: 80771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Donovan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Donovan Hair Clinic 905 - 750 West Broadway Vancouver BC V5Z 1H8
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 17 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 2018