Donya, Mohamed Ahmed El Sayed (CPSO#: 85640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2006 to 13 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008