Doobay, Dharmendra (CPSO#: 84869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dharmendra Doobay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Doobay ( CPSO# 84869 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Family Health Clinic
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9L 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHARMENDRA DOOBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOBAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2008