Doobay, Jaya Suchitra (CPSO#: 84875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Place & District Memorial
Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 253-3800
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa, ON
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Canada
Phone: 7058562335
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doobay Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doobay ( CPSO# 84875 )
Dr. C. Kirby ( CPSO# 91480 )

Business Address:
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
P.O. Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2514

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-2335

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYA SUCHITRA DOOBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOBAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2009