Dool, Jayson Sidney (CPSO#: 94578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jayson S. Dool Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 667 Champlain Street Dieppe, New Brunswick E1A 1P6
Date Received: 15 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 11 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2012