Dopp, Philip Randolph (CPSO#: 77922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3630
Fax: (705) 759-3696
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Dopp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dopp ( CPSO# 77922 )

Business Address:
750 Great Nothern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP RANDOLPH DOPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOPP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004