Dorah, Nicholas Hugh (CPSO#: 78872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit E
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone: (905) 704-1281
Fax: (905) 704-1642
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Dorah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dorah ( CPSO# 78872 )

Business Address:
Unit E
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 704-1281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HUGH DORAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 23 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 24 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008