Doris, John Fredrick (CPSO#: 52546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 743-3851
Fax: (705) 743-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Purvis and Doris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Purvis ( CPSO# 54202 )
Dr. J. Doris ( CPSO# 52546 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 876-4511

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Suite 207
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 743-3851

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDRICK DORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1987