Doris, Nadine Moira (CPSO#: 90959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 224-4440
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Doris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Doris ( CPSO# 90959 )

Business Address:
106 - 150 Cleopatra
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 224-4440

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 09 Mar 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE MOIRA DORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015