Dornan, Holly Dawn (CPSO#: 88394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
Room 2326
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6526
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Holly Dornan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dornan ( CPSO# 88394 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Room 2326
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLLY DAWN DORNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014