Dorofaeff, Tavey Fredric (CPSO#: 90136)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 16 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009