Dosani, Naheed (CPSO#: 95079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6758
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates (ICHA)
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naheed Dosani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dosani ( CPSO# 95079 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
59 Adelaide Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 775-3621

Business Address:
199 County Court Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6W 4P3
Phone Number: (905) 796-0040

Business Address:
Dean FHS
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Paliative Care
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAHEED DOSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013