Dosani, Rehana Nasreen (CPSO#: 89119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058131100 Ext. 5143
Fax: 9058134024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rehana Dosani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHANA NASREEN DOSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011