Dosman, Cara Fairclough (CPSO#: 71898)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1997 to 21 Sep 1997
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 1997 to 14 Dec 1997
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 05 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2003