Dostrovsky, Nathaniel Reuben (CPSO#: 86516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathaniel Dostrovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dostrovsky ( CPSO# 86516 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 631-6090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 25 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHANIEL REUBEN DOSTROVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSTROVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012