Douek, Jennifer Frida Katz (CPSO#: 79889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Family Medicine Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 748-4914
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centretown Community Health Centre
For transgender health care only
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 233-4443
Fax: (613) 233-4541
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Douek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Douek ( CPSO# 79889 )

Business Address:
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone Number: (613) 233-4443

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Family Medicine Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER FRIDA KATZ DOUEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2005 to 15 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006