Douglass, Rebecca Janet (CPSO#: 84651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King West Medical Associates
505 King St W,
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone: (905) 525-3501
Fax: (905) 528-5468
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglass ( CPSO# 84651 )
Dr. I. Yang ( CPSO# 84728 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANET DOUGLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008