Doulla, Manpreet (CPSO#: 93035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2012 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 29 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 09 May 2016 to 29 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2016