Dowding, Christopher Todd (CPSO#: 95455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202 - 1221 ALGONQUIN AVE
North Bay, On
P1B4Y3
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: (705) 495-8106
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
P.O. Box 2500
North Bay, Ontario P1B 5A4
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: (705) 495-8106
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Dowding Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dowding ( CPSO# 95455 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER TODD DOWDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWDING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016