Dowlatshahi, Dariush (CPSO#: 79068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue, Room C2182b
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4709
Fax: (613) 761-5360
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dowlatshahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dowlatshahi ( CPSO# 79068 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
Room C2182b
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4709

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIUSH DOWLATSHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWLATSHAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Research Fellows - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2009