Downey, Lindsay Holly (CPSO#: 90547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Downey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Downey ( CPSO# 90547 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY HOLLY DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Apr 2011 to 04 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012