Dowsley, Taylor Forbes (CPSO#: 96657)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013