Doyle, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 90748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 1402 1465 Brenton Street Halifax, NS B3J 3T3
Date Received: 13 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015