Drakhshan, Afrooz (CPSO#: 91362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: Derakhshan Chaleshtari, Afrooz (used until: 14 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shahr-E-Kord University of Med Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
300 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 1A1
Phone: (905) 597-6100
Fax: (905) 597-6111
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Drakhshan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Drakhshan ( CPSO# 91362 )

Business Address:
Suite 10
300 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 597-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFROOZ DRAKHSHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKHSHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011