Draper, Haley Elana (CPSO#: 88788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3434
Fax: (416) 603-5315
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

38 Major Street
Kensington Hospice
Toronto ON  M5S 2L1
Canada
Phone: 4169639640
Fax: 4169639466
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

GSH Medical Annex
481 Bloor street West
second floor
Toronto ON  M5R 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-0217
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haley Draper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Draper ( CPSO# 88788 )

Business Address:
38 Major Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 963-9640

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MCL 431
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
481 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 928-0217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALEY ELANA DRAPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010