Drca, Dragoslav (CPSO#: 92350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dragoslav Drca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Drca ( CPSO# 92350 )

Business Address:
Primary Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (616) 841-7009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Dec 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Dragoslav  Drca  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  primary care,
            excluding paediatrics and obstetrics.