Dressler, Brian (CPSO#: 59677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 1M1
Phone: (705) 669-1111
Fax: (705) 669-1168
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1T2
Canada
Phone: (705) 862-7991 Ext. x 245
Fax: (705) 862-7157
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot
70 Spine Road
Elliott Lake
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-7182
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

135 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Canada
Phone: (705) 673-3111
Fax: (705) 669-0499
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

300 Lincoln Street
Welland ON  L3B 4N4
Canada
Phone: 905-788-9494
Fax: 905-788-3900
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Dressler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2017


Corporation Name: Brian Dressler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dressler ( CPSO# 59677 )

Business Address:
310 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 1M1
Phone Number: (705) 669-1111

Business Address:
801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 862-7991

Business Address:
135 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Phone Number: (705) 673-3111

Business Address:
300 Lincoln Street
Welland ON  L3B 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 788-9494

Business Address:
St Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7182


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Dressler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dressler ( CPSO# 59677 )

Business Address:
135 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2
Phone Number: (705) 669-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DRESSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRESSLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989