Drewniak, Magdalena (CPSO#: 94249)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010