Drone, Troy Christie (CPSO#: 68254)

Current Status: Suspended as of 02 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Troy C. Drone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Drone ( CPSO# 68254 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
Department of Anesthesia
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 02 Jul 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jun 2018
Summary:

On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Troy Christie Drone committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Drone is a physician who currently practises as an anesthetist in Kitchener. He received his 
certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 1994. At the time of the 
incidents described below, Dr. Drone was a member of the Ontario Medical Association (“OMA”), the 
association that represents the political and economic interests of physicians in Ontario. It is the 
exclusive representative of Ontario physicians in negotiations with the Province of Ontario. 
 
Tentative Physician Services Agreement (“tPSA”) 
 
On July 11 2016, the OMA and the Ontario government reached a tentative agreement dealing with 
government funding for physician services and changes to the physician fee schedule, among other 
issues, tPSA. The tPSA was to have a term of four years, and would have replaced a previous 
agreement, which terminated in 2014. The tPSA was endorsed by the OMA’s Board, including by Dr. 
Virginia Walley, who was President of the OMA at the time. The OMA promoted the agreement in the 
weeks leading up to a General Meeting, which took place on August 14, 2016. On August 14, 2016, 
the OMA membership voted to reject the tPSA. 
 
Dr. Drone’s emails between June 21 and August 11, 2016 
 
Between June 21 and August 11, 2016, in response to the OMA’s support of the tPSA, Dr. Drone sent 
a series of emails to Dr. Walley’s personal email address, as well as to an email address used by OMA 
staff, including Dr. Walley, to communicate publicly about the tPSA. 
 
The following are excerpts from the emails: 
 - June 21, 2016: “… do your paid job and stop letting this horrible government fuck us around!!! 
   Enough already!! Listen to everyone!! Holy fuck. For fucks sake??? Fuck!!!” 
 - June 28, 2016: “… You suck!!! SUCK!!” 
 - August 1, 2016: “Dr. Walley, you are a cunt. Crash and burn as you deserve to do!! … Sincerely, 
   FUCK YOU and the OMA!!! Dr. Drone” 
 - August 10, 2016: “Fuck you!” 
 - August 11, 2016: at 6:06 pm: “Fuck-off Virginia”; 6:08 pm: “Fuck-off!”; 6:09 pm: “Fuck-off!” 
 
The emails sent by Dr. Drone were viewed by Dr. Walley as well as OMA staff who monitored the 
tPSA email address. 
 
Dr. Drone’s prior history and response during investigation   
 
Dr. Drone has no prior disciplinary history before the Discipline Committee. He provided two 
responses during the investigation, in which he apologized to Dr. Walley and acknowledged that his 
conduct was unacceptable. He also undertook Professional Communication coaching with Dawn 
Martin, Communications Specialist and Educational Consultant, to develop skills related to 
professional communication in challenging scenarios, specifically with colleagues. Dr. Drone and Dr. 
Martin met on six occasions between July 2017 and June 2018. In October 2017, Dr. Drone 
successfully completed the PROBE Ethics and Boundaries Course for physicians. 
Disposition 
 
On June 25, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-   the Registrar suspend Dr. Drone’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, 
    commencing at 12:01 a.m. on July 2, 2018. 
-   Dr. Drone appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-   Dr. Drone pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) 
    days from the date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2018