Drost, Nicole Zabrina Anne (CPSO#: 83124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 416.781.9083 fax: 1.866.297.9338 Effective May 30, 2014
Instructions: Effective May 30, 2014, the medical records of Dr. Drost will be at the above noted loaction.
Date Received: 24 Mar 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2005 to 22 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014