Drover, Shauna (CPSO#: 82776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greybruce Health Services
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 372-3954
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000


Corporation Name: Dr. Shauna Drover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
3600 - 1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA DROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DROVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010