Druce, Irena (CPSO#: 97879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4270 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K4A5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: 613-841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside
1967 Riverside Dr.
4th FL
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENA DRUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 07 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2017